U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Fairbanks v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Opposition]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 09, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 09, 2016: [Disqualify]
  • March 04, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Strike]
  • February 23, 2016: [Response]
  • February 22, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 11, 2016: [Letter(s)]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • December 23, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 18, 2015: [Financial Entry]
  • December 11, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 27, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 27, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.