U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Yellowbear v. Hargett et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • February 01, 2017: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • February 01, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 25, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 24, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 12, 2017: [Response]
  • January 11, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 10, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 15, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • June 06, 2016: [Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 11, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 09, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 05, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 05, 2016: [Status Report]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • April 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2016: [Disqualify]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 11, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 01, 2016: [Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Complexity]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 29, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 22, 2016: [Response]
  • March 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • March 04, 2016: [Stay Discovery]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 22, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 11, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 20, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • January 20, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 19, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • December 23, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 17, 2015: [Financial Entry]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 02, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 30, 2015: [Service of Process]
  • November 30, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 30, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.