U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00215
  • Case Name: Blueline Rental LLC v. Totaline Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 05, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Minute Order]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Witness List]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 07, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 17, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 13, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 12, 2016: [Set Aside]
  • January 12, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • January 08, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • January 04, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • December 15, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • November 30, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 30, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 30, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.