U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00214
  • Case Name: McLeland et al v. Pats Offroad, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 03, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 12, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 09, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 17, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 17, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • February 05, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • December 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 30, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.