U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 08, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 22, 2016: [Leave to]
  • November 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 27, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 25, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 29, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • December 01, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.