U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Sones v. ServCom Carriers LTD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 16, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 27, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 14, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 16, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 16, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 03, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 03, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 03, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 13, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 28, 2015: [Vacate]
  • December 18, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 18, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 14, 2015: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • December 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 10, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • December 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2015: [Removal]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 03, 2015: [Complaint]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.