U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Zern et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Entry]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Transcript]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2017: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
  • February 06, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • February 01, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 25, 2017: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • January 24, 2017: [Bench Trial]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Deposition]
  • January 23, 2017: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • January 19, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • January 12, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • January 04, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Designation]
  • December 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • December 09, 2016: [Bifurcate]
  • December 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Witness List]
  • September 01, 2016: [Supplement]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 25, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 05, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 03, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.