U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Easton v. Canyon Sudar Partners LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 03, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 03, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 31, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 08, 2016: [Opposition]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [In Camera Inspections]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 13, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • June 09, 2016: [Opposition]
  • June 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Compel]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 23, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • March 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 02, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 08, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 05, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 05, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2015: [Remark]
  • December 07, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.