U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:09-cv-00028
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hermes Consolidated Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.