U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:08-cv-00020
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 14, 2019: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 18, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 18, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 08, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.