U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00225
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Carr
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • January 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Strike]
  • January 12, 2016: [Remand]
  • January 11, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • December 22, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 21, 2015: [Removal]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 18, 2015: [Complaint]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.