U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00226
  • Case Name: Downhole Stabilization Rockies Inc et al v. Reliable Field Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 05, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • March 03, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 03, 2017: [Reply Brief]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 22, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 14, 2017: [Strike]
  • February 10, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 10, 2017: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Strike]
  • February 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 26, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • January 25, 2017: [Reply]
  • January 20, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2017: [Response]
  • January 19, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement]
  • January 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 06, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 06, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 06, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • June 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • May 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 07, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 25, 2016: [Brief]
  • March 25, 2016: [Set Aside]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Default Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 12, 2016: [Entry of Default]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • December 21, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.