U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Payseno v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Women's Center Associate Warde
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • February 12, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 04, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • January 05, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 04, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 23, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.