U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Teel v. Wyoming Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • March 01, 2016: [Closing Case]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Compel]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Response]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.