U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00231
  • Case Name: Universal Oil and Gas LLC et al v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 18, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • February 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 28, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • January 21, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • January 20, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.