U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:98-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Bird v. WYDOC-SP-War, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • July 15, 2016: [10th Circuit Filing]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 13, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 12, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 06, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.