U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00223
  • Case Name: Varela v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Financial Entry]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 10, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 11, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 08, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Reply to Response]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Letter(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.