U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Hodge v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 03, 2016: [Letter(s)]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 11, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 11, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 11, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 31, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.