U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Coffey v. Chevron USA Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Transcript]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Transcript]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 02, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 02, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 01, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • March 01, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 01, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 28, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 27, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 24, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 23, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 22, 2017: [Deposition]
  • February 22, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • February 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 22, 2017: [Transcript - Non Public]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • February 21, 2017: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • February 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 20, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 15, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 14, 2017: [Statement]
  • February 14, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 14, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • February 14, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 13, 2017: [Strike]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • February 10, 2017: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • February 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 30, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 20, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Compel]
  • January 12, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 20, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 16, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Strike]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Quash]
  • November 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 02, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Witness List]
  • October 11, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 11, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • October 10, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 30, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 15, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.