U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Garcia v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • March 08, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Financial Entry]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 19, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • April 18, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 04, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 16, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 14, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Compel]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 08, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.