U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Nagy v. Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2016: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Protective Order]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 12, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 12, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 24, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 10, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.