U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Villecco v. Vail Resorts Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 02, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 01, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 01, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 17, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 16, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 28, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 13, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 07, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Compel]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 02, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Witness List]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 31, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 31, 2016: [Praecipe]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 17, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 15, 2016: [Service of Process]
  • January 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.