U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Sears Roebuck and Co v. AIX Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 22, 2016: [Status Report]
  • July 12, 2016: [Status Report Order]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • February 19, 2016: [Stay Case]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 21, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • January 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.