U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Bratton v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • April 05, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 13, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Witness List]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Protective Order]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 06, 2016: [Praecipe]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.