U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Ketcham et al v. National Park Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Reply Brief]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 15, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • August 12, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Opposition]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • April 22, 2016: [Opposition]
  • April 08, 2016: [Reconsideration]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 29, 2016: [Response]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Objection]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 03, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 03, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 28, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 28, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 26, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.