U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00018
  • Case Name: United States of America v. One Smith & Wesson .44 caliber 29 Revolver et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • March 29, 2016: [Default Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 05, 2016: [Application]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.