U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Aikins v. Northern Wyoming Community College District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Status Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • January 25, 2017: [Exhibit/Witness List]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 07, 2016: [Vacate]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continue (Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 14, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 25, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.