U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Rice et al v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 27, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 01, 2017: [Trial Brief]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 30, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • January 30, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 26, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 25, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • January 24, 2017: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • January 19, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 18, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 09, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • December 13, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 02, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Brief]
  • November 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 14, 2016: [Witness List]
  • October 14, 2016: [Designation]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 11, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2016: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.