U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Chesapeake Energy Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 18, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • July 05, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 22, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 14, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 14, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 26, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 16, 2016: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • February 08, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 05, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • February 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.