U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Roberts et al v. Jackson Hole Mountain Resort Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • February 24, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • February 15, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 14, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 05, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 21, 2016: [Strike]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 12, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Witness List]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 03, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • April 25, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • April 25, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 20, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 23, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 23, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.