U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Addleman et al v. HollyFrontier Cheyenne Refining LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 10, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 19, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 08, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • June 01, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 11, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • May 11, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 10, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 13, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 11, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • April 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.