U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00038
  • Case Name: Nazareta v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 01, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 13, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 14, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • February 26, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.