U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Grimm v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • March 04, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.