U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Lindley Construction Inc et al v. Bank of the West
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 18, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 30, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 20, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 03, 2016: [Dismiss]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 14, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 25, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 22, 2016: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 21, 2016: [Removal]
  • March 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.