U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00051
  • Case Name: North Cache Investments LLC v. Bank of Jackson Hole
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 18, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 17, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 02, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 02, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 30, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 16, 2016: [Designation]
  • December 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Strike]
  • December 13, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Strike]
  • December 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • November 17, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • October 12, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 11, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • July 15, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 08, 2016: [Reply Brief]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 17, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • May 09, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • April 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 11, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.