U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Rothschild et al v. United States of America Department of Defense Department of the Army Sercretary of the U.S. Army et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 12, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 05, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 21, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.