U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Payseno v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Women's Center Associate Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Financial Entry]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Mail Returned]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Letter(s)]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Reply]
  • May 04, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 04, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2016: [Letter(s)]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2016: [Response]
  • March 17, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.