U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Wyoming Coalition of Local Governments v. United States Department of the Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Status Report]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Status Report]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Status Report]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Status Report]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Status Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 12, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 25, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Status Report]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Status Report]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Status Report]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 06, 2017: [Stay Case]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 12, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Status Report]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 13, 2017: [Status Report]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Status Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2017: [Intervene]
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 03, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 24, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 26, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Consolidate Cases for Discovery]
  • March 30, 2016: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 28, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 22, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.