U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00026
  • Case Name: EagleMed LLC et al v. Wyoming Department of Workforce Services Workers Compensation Division
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 21, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • May 29, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 23, 2018: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • May 22, 2018: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • May 07, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 07, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 20, 2018: [Strike]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 14, 2018: [Reply]
  • March 13, 2018: [Request for Hearing]
  • March 13, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Request for Hearing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • February 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 23, 2018: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Mandate]
  • September 13, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 18, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 18, 2016: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • July 28, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 26, 2016: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 21, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 11, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 06, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • June 30, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • June 24, 2016: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • June 24, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • June 20, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • June 17, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 17, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 15, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • June 09, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2016: [In Court Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Response]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.