U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00055
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Wyoming Military Department
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • April 17, 2018: [Objection]
  • April 04, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 28, 2017: [Designation]
  • July 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 27, 2017: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • July 27, 2017: [Bench Trial]
  • July 25, 2017: [Bench Trial]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 25, 2017: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • July 25, 2017: [Deposition]
  • July 24, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • July 20, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • July 19, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 12, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • July 05, 2017: [Designation]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 27, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • June 26, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 05, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • June 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 22, 2017: [- Non Public Document]
  • May 22, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • May 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 19, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2017: [Witness List]
  • April 03, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 29, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 28, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 27, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 24, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Reply]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 24, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 24, 2017: [Opposition]
  • January 10, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Protective Order]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • August 22, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Opposition]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 14, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2016: [Opposition]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • May 11, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • April 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 25, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.