U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Perry v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 02, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • September 02, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • September 01, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 01, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 30, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Reply to Response]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 27, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • April 27, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 26, 2016: [Expedite]
  • April 26, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • March 31, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 31, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 31, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.