U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Snyder v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • December 13, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [USCA Notification]
  • January 30, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 04, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • October 26, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • October 13, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 12, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Reply to Response]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 27, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 26, 2016: [Expedite]
  • April 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • March 31, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 31, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.