U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Hodkoski v. Wyoming Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Financial Entry]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Objection]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2016: [Strike]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2016: [Reply]
  • August 03, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • July 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2016: [Response]
  • July 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 07, 2016: [Objection]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 22, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 17, 2016: [Martinez Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 17, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 11, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 10, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2016: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.