U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. American Colloid Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 30, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • July 31, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • July 28, 2017: [Stay Discovery]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 26, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Protective Order]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 14, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • May 20, 2016: [Response]
  • May 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 09, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
  • May 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 19, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • April 01, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • April 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.