U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Merrill v. Amazon.com Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 09, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 18, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Protective Order]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 24, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 12, 2016: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • April 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 05, 2016: [Removal]
  • April 04, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.