U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Great American Assurance Company et al v. Interstate Fire & Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 06, 2019: [Stay Case]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 11, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 07, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 03, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 02, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 01, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • October 17, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 08, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 06, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 06, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 19, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 09, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Answer to Crossclaim]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • August 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2016: [Counterclaim]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 24, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 16, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 03, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 28, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.