U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Farm Credit Services of America FLCA et al v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Response]
  • March 09, 2017: [Writ Returned]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Application for Writ]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Response]
  • December 28, 2016: [Application for Writ]
  • December 19, 2016: [Writ Returned]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Application for Writ]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Setting Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • April 08, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.