U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Vigil v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on 2255 Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 28, 2016: [Brief]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 12, 2016: [Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • June 13, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 03, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • June 02, 2016: [Recusal]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 23, 2016: [Compel]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • May 10, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 11, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2016: [Recusal]
  • April 08, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.