U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Tackett v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Praecipe]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 12, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.