U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Counts v. Wilson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [USCA Notification]
  • March 08, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 09, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 09, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Response]
  • September 26, 2016: [Response]
  • September 26, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Objection]
  • September 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 16, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Opposition]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Response]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 29, 2016: [Objection]
  • August 26, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 26, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 22, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 18, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 01, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 13, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 03, 2016: [Response]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 23, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 23, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 23, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • May 11, 2016: [Recusal]
  • May 10, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Recusal]
  • May 09, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 19, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 14, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • April 13, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.